This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 09/24/2021 at 17:04:12 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO. 61 VS MB HOUSTON ELDRIDGE TOWN CENTER LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO 61 filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MB HOUSTON ELDRIDGE TOWN CENTER LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGE BARNSTONE and LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4844

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

GEORGE BARNSTONE

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO. 61

Defendant

MB HOUSTON ELDRIDGE TOWN CENTER LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

C/O Ct Corporation System 1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Commissioners

Alan R. Scheinthal

Houston, TX 77027

AUDRIE L. LAWTON

Houston, TX 77220

Felecia Y. Peavy

Houston, TX 77253

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RADICH, PAUL STEPHEN

Attorney at SMITH, MURDAUGH, LITTLE & BONHAM, LLP

2727 Allen Parkway, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77019

Defendant Attorney

BROOKS, SEJINCURTIS

808 Nueces Street

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

2021_09_14 M2W w Ex 1 - CCL4 [PAR 28].pdf

Motion to Withdraw Funds: & Proposed Order to Withdraw Funds

2021_09_14 proposed Order on M2W - CCL4 (PAR 28).pdf

Motion to Withdraw Funds: & Proposed Order to Withdraw Funds

2021_09_14 NOS-CCL4 (PAR 28).pdf

Notice of Submission

2021-02-05 Petition and Statement - 28.pdf

eFile Original Petition: CONDEMNATION

2021-02-05 Order Appointing SCs - 28.pdf

Proposed Order: ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Spc. Comm. - sent to Judge

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

2021_03_25 NOA (PAR 28).pdf

Notice of Appearance

2021-02-26 Oath of SCs - 28.pdf

Proposed Order: OATH OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: Award of Special Commissioners w/Fees-Donald Stricklin-Email

Award- Sent to Judge

Award: of Special Commissioners w/Fees

2021-07-13 Notice of Deposit - 28.pdf

Notice: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT FOR POSSESSION OF PROPERTY

2021_07_14 M2W w Ex 1 [PAR 28].pdf

Motion to Withdraw Funds: & Proposed Order to Withdraw Funds

2021_07_14 proposed Order on M2W (PAR 28).pdf

Motion to Withdraw Funds: & Proposed Order to Withdraw Funds

2021_07_14 Notice of Submission (PAR 28).pdf

Notice of Submission: DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAE AWARD

Order of Transfer (accepted by Judge)

Order of Transfer (accepted by Judge): Transferred from Court 1 to Court 4

Order of Transfer - Sent to Juge

Order of Transfer (accepted by Judge): Transferred from Court 1 to Court 4

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Withdraw Funds: & Proposed Order to Withdraw Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Transfer (accepted by Judge): Transferred from Court 1 to Court 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Withdraw Funds: & Proposed Order to Withdraw Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Submission: DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAE AWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT FOR POSSESSION OF PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: Award of Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: Award of Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Disclaimer of Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE AND WAIVER OF FORMAL SERVICE OF PROCESS OF

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing of Special Commissioners: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: ORDER SETTING HEARING BEFORE COMMISSIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: OATH OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: Award of Special Commissioners w/Fees-Donald Stricklin-Email

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAward: of Special Commissioners w/Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: CONDEMNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MB HOUSTON ELDRIDGE TOWN CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO. 61 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROOKS, SEJINCURTIS