This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/27/2021 at 14:47:48 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO. 61 VS MB HOUSTON ELDRIDGE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO 61 filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MB HOUSTON ELDRIDGE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4576

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO. 61

Defendant

MB HOUSTON ELDRIDGE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

C/O C T Corporation System 1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Commissioners

TIFFANY HILL

Houston, TX 77025

SETH KRETZER

Houston, TX 77002

CARL DAVIS

Houston, TX 77085-2258

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RADICH, PAUL STEPHEN

Attorney at SMITH, MURDAUGH, LITTLE & BONHAM, LLP

2727 Allen Parkway, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77019

Defendant Attorney

BROOKS, SEJINCURTIS

808 Nueces Street

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

2021_03_25 NOA (PAR 23).pdf

Notice of Appearance

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing SCs - (submitted).pdf

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

2021-02-01 Petition and Statement - 23.pdf

eFile Original Petition: PETITION AND STATEMENT IN CONDEMNATION

2021-02-01 Notice of Hearing - 23.pdf

Proposed Order: NOTICE OF HEARING

2021-02-01 Oath of SCs - 23.pdf

Proposed Order: OATH OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

2021-02-01 Order Appointing SCs - 23.pdf

Proposed Order: ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

2021-02-01 Order setting Hearing Before SCs - 23.pdf

Proposed Order: ORDER SETTING HEARING BEFORE SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: PETITION AND STATEMENT IN CONDEMNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: OATH OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: ORDER SETTING HEARING BEFORE SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MB HOUSTON ELDRIDGE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO. 61 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROOKS, SEJINCURTIS