Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 07/24/2021 at 15:31:32 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO. 61 VS PALM SPRINGS PLAZA, L.L.C.,GOLDEN BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO 61 filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PALM SPRINGS PLAZA, L L C ,GOLDEN BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE BARNSTONE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4018

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE BARNSTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO. 6

HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO. 61

Defendants

GOLDEN BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

9315 Bellaire Boulevard

Houston, TX 77036

PALM SPRINGS PLAZA, L.L.C.

C/O Charles Song 10101 Harwin Drive, Suite 298

Houston, TX 77036

Commissioners

BERNARDO J. GARCIA

Houston, TX 77018

AUDRIE L. LAWTON

Houston, TX 77220

CHARISSE COLEMAN

Houston, TX 77083

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RADICH, PAUL STEPHEN

Attorney at SMITH, MURDAUGH, LITTLE & BONHAM, LLP

2727 Allen Parkway, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77019

Defendant Attorneys

ABREO, DAMIAN W.

Attorney at Hughes, Watters, Askanase LLP

1201 Louisiana St., 28Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

BAKER, JEREMY DANIEL

Attorney at BRETT B. WARREN, P.C.

22310 Grand Corner Drive, Suite 100

Katy, TX 77494

 

Court Documents

1164018 Disclaimer of Interest

Disclaimer: of Interest

2021-07-02 Notice of Deposit - 9.pdf

Notice: OF DEPOSIT FOR POSSESSION OF PROPERTY

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: award of special commissioner

Funds to Registry of Court

Funds to Registry of Court: TO BE DEPOSITED INTO THE REGISTRY OF THE COURT (AWARD) $5,074.00

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: Award of Special Commissioners with Fees

2021-02-05 Notice of Hearing - Golden Bank - 9.pdf

Notice of Hearing of Special Commissioners

2021-02-05 Notice of Hearing - Palm Springs - 9.pdf

Notice of Hearing of Special Commissioners

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: Award of Special Commissioners with Fees-Donald Stricklin-Emailed

executed Waiver of Service.pdf

Notice: Waiver of Service of Defendant's Objections to Award of Special Commissioners

Designation of Lead Counsel.pdf

Designation: of Lead Counsel

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Appointment- Sent to Judge

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

2021-01-21 Petition and Statement - 9.pdf

eFile Original Petition: CONDEMNATION

2021-01-21 Notice of Hearing - 9.pdf

Notice of Hearing

2021-01-21 Oath of SCs - 9.pdf

Proposed Order: OATH OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

2021-01-21 Order Appointing SCs - 9.pdf

Proposed Order: ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

2021-01-21 Order Setting Hearing Before SCs - 9.pdf

Proposed Order: ORDER SETTING HEARING BEFORE SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisclaimer: of Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: OF DEPOSIT FOR POSSESSION OF PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: award of special commissioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFunds to Registry of Court: TO BE DEPOSITED INTO THE REGISTRY OF THE COURT (AWARD) $5,074.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: Award of Special Commissioners with Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: Award of Special Commissioners with Fees-Donald Stricklin-Emailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Waiver of Service of Defendant's Objections to Award of Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing of Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing of Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing of Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAward: of Special Commisoners with Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: Defendant Golden Bank, National Association's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDesignation: of Lead Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: CONDEMNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: OATH OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: ORDER SETTING HEARING BEFORE SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PALM SPRINGS PLAZA, L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where GOLDEN BANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO. 61 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RADICH, PAUL STEPHEN