Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/01/2021 at 14:20:24 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT VS TRINIDAD HERNANDEZ,LINDA HERNANDEZ,JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A.,U.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION,UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against TRINIDAD HERNANDEZ,LINDA HERNANDEZ,JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N A ,U S SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION,UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8879

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

Defendants

LINDA HERNANDEZ

Houston, TX 77039-1710

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A.

C/O Ct Corporation System 1999 Bryan St. Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201-3136

U.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION

TRINIDAD HERNANDEZ

Houston, TX 77039-1710

Commissioners

Don Coffey

Baytown, TX 77521

DANIEL EARLE HINDE

Houston, TX 77002

DAMARIS A. CHAVEZ

Pasadena, TX 77502

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STRICKLIN, DONALD ALLEN

Attorney at HARRIS COUNTY, ASSISTANT COUNTY ATTORNEY

1019 Congress, 15Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Thomas, Joy

1019 Congress Plaza, 15 Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorneys

HILL, J. MARCUS

Attorney at HILL & HILL PC

1770 St. James Place, Suite 115

Houston, TX 77056

Cowan, Chad W

1000 Louisiana, Ste 2300

Houston, TX 77002

SUAREZ, SUZANNE

Attorney at Bonial & Associates PC

14841 Dallas Parkway Suite 425

Dallas, TX 75254

 

Court Documents

HERNANDEZ Notice change of atty.pdf

Designation of Attorney: for Plaintiff

Funds to Registry of Court

Funds to Registry of Court: to be deposited into the Courts Registry $190,000.00

Chase_Supp_Answer_Bookmarked.pdf

Supplemental: to its Original Answer

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: AWARD OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONER

Notices Returned

Notices Returned

Hearing 061720 signed reporters certs.pdf

Notice of Hearing of Special Commissioners: SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS HEARING, JUNE 17, 2O2O

Objections

Objections: signed objection

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: Award of Special Commissioners

Defendants' Objection to the Award of the Special Commissioners - Hernandez .pdf

Objections: Objection to the Award

1. HERNANDEZ COGIC.pdf

Condemnation: CONDEMNATION

3. HERNANDEZ LTR TO COMM.pdf

Letter: LETTER TO COMMISSIONERS

5. HERNANDEZ OATH.pdf

Proposed Order: OATH

4. HERNANDEZ APPT OF COMM.pdf

Proposed Order: APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

7. HERNANDEZ INFO SHT.pdf

Proposed Order: APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

8. HERNANDEZ NTC OF HRG.pdf

Proposed Order: ORDER SETTING TIME AND PLACE OF HEARING

6. HERNANDEZ ORDER SETTING HRG.pdf

Proposed Order: ORDER SETTING TIME AND PLACE OF HEARING

9. HERNANDEZ AMD NTC OF HRG.pdf

Proposed Order: ORDER SETTING TIME AND PLACE OF HEARING

10. HERNANDEZ 2ND AMD NTC.pdf

Proposed Order: ORDER SETTING TIME AND PLACE OF HEARING

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDesignation of Attorney: for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFunds to Registry of Court: to be deposited into the Courts Registry $190,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSupplemental: to its Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: AWARD OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing of Special Commissioners: SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS HEARING, JUNE 17, 2O2O

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: Award of Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjections: signed objection

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjections: Objection to the Award

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Setting Commissioners Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOath of Special Commissioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCondemnation: CONDEMNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter: LETTER TO COMMISSIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: OATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: ORDER SETTING TIME AND PLACE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Harris County Flood Control District is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Unite States of America Dept of Treasury is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant