Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 02/27/2021 at 04:01:12 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT VS ROY TEAGUE,MARIO J. PORCHEDDU,SHIRLEY PORCHEDDU

Case Summary

On 06/30/2020 HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ROY TEAGUE,MARIO J PORCHEDDU,SHIRLEY PORCHEDDU. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6345

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

Defendants

SHIRLEY PORCHEDDU

Willis, TX 77318

ROY TEAGUE

Hockley, TX 77447

MARIO J. PORCHEDDU

Willis, TX 77318

Commissioners

Edna Griggs

Houston, TX 77091

Laolu Davies Yemitan

Houston, TX 77005

Nekketta M Archie

Houston, TX 77288

Cassandra Poulos

Not Classified By Court

Lisa A Ketai

Houston, TX 77002

JEFFREY R. NEWPORT

Houston, TX 77024

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ibrahim, Sarah

Attorney at Vince Ryan County Attorney

1019 Congress Plaza, 15Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Thomas, Joy

1019 Congress Plaza, 15 Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorney

CRUMP, PHILLIP RANDALL

Attorney at Crump & Deutsch PLLC

2825 Wilcrest Drive Suite 216

Houston, TX 77042

 

Court Documents

teague Notice change of atty.pdf

Designation of Attorney

Notices Returned

Notices Returned

1156345 Disclaimer

Disclaimer

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Funds to Registry of Court

Funds to Registry of Court: TO BE DEPOSITED INTO THE REGISTRY OF THE COURT (AWARD) $204,841.00

1156345 TEAGUE - NOTICE OF HEARING.pdf

Notice of Hearing of Special Commissioners: NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER SUBSTITUTING COMMISSIONER.pdf

Proposed Order: Proposed Order Appointing Substitute Special Commissioner--submitted 7/21

ORDER SUBSTITUTING COMMISSIONER.pdf

Order Appointing Substitute Commissioner

appt order.pdf

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

petition.pdf

Condemnation: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION IN CONDEMNATION

EXB A.pdf

Condemnation: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION IN CONDEMNATION

appt order.pdf

Proposed Order: APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDesignation of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisclaimer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFunds to Registry of Court: TO BE DEPOSITED INTO THE REGISTRY OF THE COURT (AWARD) $204,841.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: Award of Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: Award of Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: award of special commissioner-email-donald stricklin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjections

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOath of Special Commissioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: ORDER SETTING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Setting Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing of Special Commissioners: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Substitute Commissioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Proposed Order Appointing Substitute Special Commissioner--submitted 7/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCondemnation: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION IN CONDEMNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Harris County Flood Control District is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRUMP, PHILLIP RANDALL