This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 08/01/2020 at 17:43:41 (UTC).

GWR EXCELSIOR LLC VS LAQUITA YOUNG,ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 GWR EXCELSIOR LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LAQUITA YOUNG,ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6553

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GWR Excelsior LLC

C/O Eddie Dean Young 6300 La Calma Dr, Ste 150

Austin, TX 78752

Defendants

Laquita Young

Houston, TX 77014

All Other Occupants

Houston, TX 77014

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAKE, PATRICK GLEN

Attorney at MESSNER REEVES LLP

6465 Greenwood Plaza, Ste. 650

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

IB3-Excelsior on the Park-Young, Laquita Writ Request (04030231xA9B4D).pdf

Writ of Possession to be Issued: Plaintiff's Request for Writ of Possession to issue 3-20-20

IB3-Excelsior on the Park-Young, LaQuita - NOA (Goldberg) (04024947xA9B4D).pdf

Notice of Appearance

Order Reinstating Case (03967192xA9B4D).pdf

Motion to Reinstate: and Proposed Order

Ntc of Submission (03971160xA9B4D).pdf

Notice of Submission

Order Reinstating Case (03967192xA9B4D).pdf

Order to Reinstate (OCA)

JP Officer's Sworn Request for Alt Svc Under Rule 742A

JP Officer's Sworn Request for Alt Svc Under Rule 742A

JP Citation Returned

JP Citation Returned

JP Judgment

JP Judgment

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION IN AN EVICTION PROCEEDING

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL AN EVICTION JUDGMENT

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

JP Index

JP Index

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession to be Issued: Plaintiff's Request for Writ of Possession to issue 3-20-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Reinstate (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Reinstate: and Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter: to Court with Verification

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Officer's Sworn Request for Alt Svc Under Rule 742A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION IN AN EVICTION PROCEEDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF FILING STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL AN EVICTION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTranscript from Justice of the Peace Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Index

    Read MoreRead Less