This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 11/14/2021 at 13:57:13 (UTC).

GUSTAVO VELASCO VS DAYSI GUEVARA

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 GUSTAVO VELASCO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DAYSI GUEVARA. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6286

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Gustavo Velasco

Counter Plaintiff and Defendant

Daysi Guevara

Houston, TX 77090

Not Classified By Court

CHRISTOPHER L. BUCK

Spring, TX 77380

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

CHAVEZ, KEVIN MAGDIEL

6260 Westpark Drive Suite 303

Houston, TX 77057

Counter Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

MULLER, MATT

1021 Main Street Ste 1275

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS ORDER TO COMPEL TO JUDGE

Order to Compel: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AND INTEROGATORIES

P Motion to Compel Discov

Motion to Compel: Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs Request for Admissions and First Interrogatories

Motion Compel Discov ORDER (aug 6)

Motion to Compel: Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs Request for Admissions and First Interrogatories

exhibit 3

Motion to Compel: Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs Request for Admissions and First Interrogatories

exhibit 2

Motion to Compel: Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs Request for Admissions and First Interrogatories

exhibit 1

Motion to Compel: Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs Request for Admissions and First Interrogatories

Motion compel NOTICE-1_20210805_162615

Notice of Submission

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Jury Demand.pdf

Jury Fee: jury demand

Certificate of Written Discovery.pdf

Certificate of Written Discovery

Affidavit of Service.pdf

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

Exhibit B - Daysi Guevara Contract.pdf

eFile Original Petition

Exhibit A - Gustavo Velasco NGL Contract.pdf

eFile Original Petition

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Compel: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AND INTEROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel: Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs Request for Admissions and First Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Written Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Fee: jury demand

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCounter Claim: and Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MULLER, MATT