This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 01/18/2023 at 02:34:56 (UTC).

GREEN TREE SERVCNG LLC VS ESPINOSA APRIL

Case Summary

On 08/01/2022 GREEN TREE SERVCNG LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ESPINOSA APRIL. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MANPREET SINGH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******-801

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MANPREET SINGH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREEN TREE SERVCNG LLC

Defendant

ESPINOSA APRIL

Houston, TX 77061

Garnishee

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

1999 Bryan St., Ste. 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Garnishor

Green Tree Servicing, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Garnishor Attorney

King, James W

6420 Wellington Place

Beaumont, TX 77706

 

Court Documents

Clerk.file.WOG.pdf

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment to be Issued

Application for Garnishment No-Fee

Application for Garnishment No-Fee

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment Issued: M/O ATTY

Garnishment Nonsuit Order - to Judge

Garnishment Dismissal Order

Notice Garnishment Non-Suit

Garnishment Dismissal Order

Clerk.file.NONWOG.pdf

Letter: to Clerk to file Notice of Nonsuit of Garnishment

Order.Dismiss.pdf

Proposed Order: Order of Dismissal of Garnishment

NONWOG.pdf

Motion for Non-Suit: Notice of Nonsuit of Garnishment

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGarnishment Dismissal Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter: to Clerk to file Notice of Nonsuit of Garnishment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Order of Dismissal of Garnishment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit: Notice of Nonsuit of Garnishment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment Issued: M/O ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment to be Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Garnishment No-Fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases where Ditech Financial LLC FKA Green Tree Servicing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer King, James W