Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 09/16/2019 at 16:16:05 (UTC).

GRACIANO ESPIRICUETA DBA GRACIANO & ISABEL CONTRACTORS VS ROCO-ARLINGTON PLACE, LLC,ROCO-FOREST VIEW, LLC,ROCO MANAGEMENT, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/31/2019 GRACIANO ESPIRICUETA DBA GRACIANO ISABEL CONTRACTORS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROCO-ARLINGTON PLACE, LLC,ROCO-FOREST VIEW, LLC,ROCO MANAGEMENT, LLC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM MCLEOD and LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7126

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

WILLIAM MCLEOD

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Graciano Espiricueta DBA Graciano & Isabel Contractors

Defendants

Roco-Arlington Place, LLC

1601 Elm St Ste 4360

Dallas, TX 75201

ROCO Management, LLC

1601 Elm St Ste 4360

Dallas, TX 75201

Roco-Forest View, LLC

1601 Elm St Ste 4360

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIXA, JACK P.

14300 Cornerstone Village Dr. Suite 332

Houston, TX 77014

 

Court Documents

Motion for Entry of Default Judgment.pdf

Motion for Default Judgment

Certificate of Last Known Address.pdf

Certificate: Certificate of Last Known Address

Affidavit of Attorney for Attorneys Fees.pdf

Affidavit: Affidavit for Attorney's Fees

DEFAULT JUDGMENT.pdf

Proposed Order

Default Judgment and Notice

Default Judgment and Notice

Default Judgment and Notice

Default Judgment and Notice

Default Judgment and Notice

Default Judgment and Notice

Default Judgment and Notice

Default Judgment and Notice

Default Judgment and Notice

Default Judgment and Notice

Service Request Form.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Petition for Suit on Sworn Account

Petition for Suit on Sworn Account.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Petition for Suit on Sworn Account

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: (mailed to atty)

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: (mailed to atty)

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: (mailed to atty)

ROCO-FOREST VIEW, LLC - CIT RETURN.pdf

Return of Service

ROCO-ARLINGTON PLACE, LLC - CIT RETURN.pdf

Return of Service

ROCO MANAGEMENT, LLC - CIT RETURN.pdf

Return of Service

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Default Judgment and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit: Affidavit for Attorney's Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate: Certificate of Last Known Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Petition Citation Issued: (mailed to atty)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Petition Citation Issued: (mailed to atty)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Petition Citation Issued: (mailed to atty)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • eFile Original Petition: Petition for Suit on Sworn Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Original Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Roco Management LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mixa, Jack P