Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/15/2017 at 06:36:16 (UTC).

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE ET AL. VS. EAGLE COLLISION REPAIR INC

Case Summary

On 02/21/2014 GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EAGLE COLLISION REPAIR INC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LINDA STOREY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4108

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LINDA STOREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NAGLE THOMAS

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE

GEICO INDEMNITY

GEICO ADVANTAGE INSURANCE

COLONIAL COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

GEICO CASUALTY

GEICO SECURE INSURANCE

GEICO CHOICE INSURANCE

THOMAS NAGLE

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE

Defendant

EAGLE COLLISION REPAIR INC

8000 Old Galveston Road

Houston, TX 77034

Not Classified By Court

Bryan D Coleman

Houston,, TX 77007

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MURPHY JOHN D

Attorney at DAVID KNIGHT AND ASSOCIATES

217 Avondale

Houston, TX 77006

KNIGHT, DAVID S.

217 Avondale

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant Attorney

BRUCE, JONATHAN E

12810 Traviata Drive

Houston, TX 77024

 

Court Documents

Crt 3-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 3-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 3-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 3-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 3-Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Crt 3-Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Crt 3-Parties Receiving Mediation Notice

Crt 3-Parties Receiving Mediation Notice

Amended Petition

Amended Petition: PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED PETITION FILED BY CARLA BENNETT Film code number CCCL-2014-237241

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing: CONTINUANCE & ENTRY OF NEW DOCKET CONTROL ORDER Film code number CCCL-2014-237250

Motion for Continuance

Motion for Continuance: AND FOR ENTRY OF NEW DOCKET CONTROL ORDER Film code number CCCL-2014-243548

Order for Continuance

Order for Continuance: GRANTED Film code number CCCL-2014-243919

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Citation Issued

Citation Issued

Crt 3-Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Crt 3-Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Crt 3-Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC-A

Crt 3-Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC-A

Amended Petition

Amended Petition: PLAINTIFFS AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION FILED BY DAVID KNIGHT Film code number CCCL-2014-113956

Order Not Entered

Order Not Entered: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE AND FOR ENTRY OF NEW DOCKET CONTROL ORDER Film code number CCCL-2014-243547

Crt 3-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 3-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • Electronic Filing Fee: NOTICE OF NON SUIT WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Designation: OF EXPERTS Film code number CCCL-2014-287461

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • Electronic Filing Fee: DESIGNATION OF EXPERTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Order for Continuance: GRANTED Film code number CCCL-2014-243919

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Crt 3-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2014
  • Electronic Filing Fee: DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • Conversion Service Event: Executed: N;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Citation Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • Attorney Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • Attorney Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • Electronic Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • Jury Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • RECEIVABLE GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Initiation Event (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Eagle Collision Repair Center, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where COLONIAL COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO Secure Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Geico Choice Insurance Company is a litigant