This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 12/30/2022 at 16:00:10 (UTC).

GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA VS DARIUS HANDY

Case Summary

On 11/01/2022 GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DARIUS HANDY. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4138

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Goldman Sachs Bank Usa

Defendant

Darius Handy

Houston, TX 77087

Not Classified By Court

Dispute Resolution Center

49 San Jacinto, Suite 220

Houston, TX 77002-1233

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Manning, Olen, III

Attorney at Zwicker & Associates, P.C.

14090 Sw Freeway, Suite 408

Sugar Land, TX 77478

Defendant Attorney

Johnson, Jonathon Chadwick

Attorney at Johnson & Bryan

701 N. Post Oak Rd.,, Suite 140

Houston, TX 77024

 

Court Documents

Zwicker_6049941_let_eABC.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

Zwicker_6049941_pet_eABC.pdf

eFile Original Petition

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC

Filing Ltr to Clerk 11-11-22-signed.pdf

Answer: Defendant's Original Answer

Defendant Original Answer-signed.pdf

Answer: Defendant's Original Answer

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation to DRC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: Defendant's Original Answer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Goldman Sachs Bank USA is a litigant

Latest cases where Dispute Resolution Center is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHNSON, JONATHON CHADWICK