Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/15/2017 at 21:00:41 (UTC).

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE ET AL. VS. NORTHWEST COLLISION

Case Summary

On 08/05/2014 GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NORTHWEST COLLISION. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is THERESA CHANG. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1337

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

THERESA CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOLINA DANA

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

GEICO SECURE INSURANCE

GEICO INDEMNITY

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE,

GEICO CHOICE INSURANCE

GEICO CASUALTY

GEICO ADVANTAGE INSURANCE

COLONIAL COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

DANA MOLINA

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE

Defendants

NORTHWEST COLLISION

Houston, TX 77018

BRIAN ANTHONY SOSA

NORTHWEST COLLISION REPAIR, INC.

Stephenson Snokhous & Fournier, Llp 4544 Post Oak Place Drive, Suite 378

Houston, TX 77027

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BENNETT CARLA

Attorney at DAVID KNIGHT & ASSOCIATES

217 Avondale

Houston, TX 77006

WALLACE, GERALD L

Attorney at DAVID KNIGHT AND ASSOCIATES

217 Avondale

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant Attorney

VASTINE, SCOTT KERR

Attorney at EMMONS AND JACKSON PC

3900 Essex Lane Suite 1116

Houston, TX 77027

 

Court Documents

Citation Issued

Citation Issued

Crt 2-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 2-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 2-Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution

Crt 2-Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution

Amended Petition

Amended Petition: FIRST AMENDED Film code number CCCL-2015-151558

Answer

Answer: DEFENDANT'S VERIFIED ORIGINAL ANSWER Film code number CCCL-2015-229016

First Amended Petition Citation Issued

First Amended Petition Citation Issued: SECOND AMENDED PETITION CITATION Film code number CCCL-2015-270253

Motion for Continuance

Motion for Continuance: SECOND UNOPPOSED Film code number CCCL-2016-14386

Letter

Letter: FROM DAVID KNIGHT AND ASSOCIATES Film code number CCCL-2016-59841

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Motion to Retain

Motion to Retain: VERIFIED Film code number CCCL-2015-171947

Crt 2-Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution

Crt 2-Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution

Order Granted

Order Granted: ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RETAIN Film code number CCCL-2015-170969

Motion to Retain

Motion to Retain: PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED MOTION TO RETAIN Film code number CCCL-2015-246348

Crt 2-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 2-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Amended Petition

Amended Petition: THIRD AMENDED Film code number CCCL-2015-434245

First Amended Petition Citation Issued

First Amended Petition Citation Issued

Crt 2-Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution

Crt 2-Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter: FROM GERALD L. WALLACE Film code number CCCL-2016-64154

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter: FROM DAVID KNIGHT AND ASSOCIATES Film code number CCCL-2016-59841

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • Electronic Filing Fee: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE & ORDER, COVER LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Service: SERVED ON 1-20-16 Film code number CCCL-2016-35261

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • Electronic Filing Fee: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Electronic Filing Fee: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2014
  • Attorney Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • Attorney Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • Conversion Service Event: Executed: N;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Citation Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Electronic Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Jury Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • E-Filing Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • RECEIVABLE GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Initiation Event (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLONIAL COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Geico Choice Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO Secure Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Geico Advantage Insurance Company is a litigant