Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/16/2017 at 01:33:47 (UTC).

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE ET AL. VS. COPPERFIELD COLLISION

Case Summary

On 09/25/2014 GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against COPPERFIELD COLLISION. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERTA LLOYD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3324

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERTA LLOYD

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SIERRA NOEL

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

GEICO SECURE INSURANCE

GEICO INDEMNITY,

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE

GEICO CHOICE INSURANCE

GEICO CASUALTY

GEICO ADVANTAGE INSURANCE

COLONIAL COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY,

GEICO INDEMNITY

COLONIAL COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

NOEL SIERRA

Defendant

COPPERFIELD COLLISION

Houston, TX 77042

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BENNETT CARLA

217 Avondale

Houston, TX 77006

WALLACE, GERALD L

Attorney at DAVID KNIGHT AND ASSOCIATES

217 Avondale

Houston, TX 77006

 

Court Documents

Crt 4-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 4-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Amended Petition

Amended Petition: PLAINTIFF COPPERFIELD COLLISION CENTER, LLC'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION Film code number CCCL-2015-14485

First Amended Petition Citation Issued

First Amended Petition Citation Issued: SECOND AMENDED CITATION W/ ADMS. DISC. INTERROG. PROD. Film code number CCCL-2015-108290

Citation Returned

Citation Returned: SECRETARY OF STATE Film code number CCCL-2015-141800

Crt 4-Order for Trial Resetting-Jury

Crt 4-Order for Trial Resetting-Jury

Order for Continuance

Order for Continuance: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS'UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE Film code number CCCL-2015-342251

Letter

Letter: FROM GERALD L. WALLACE Film code number CCCL-2015-417014

Letter

Letter: FROM GERALD L WALLACE Film code number CCCL-2016-1548

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Case Initiation Event (OCA)

Case Initiation Event (OCA)

First Amended Petition Adms Disc Int Prod Citation Issued

First Amended Petition Adms Disc Int Prod Citation Issued

Amended Petition

Amended Petition: PLAINTIFF;S SECOND AMENDED PETITION Film code number CCCL-2015-96030

Crt 4-Order for Trial Resetting-Jury

Crt 4-Order for Trial Resetting-Jury

Letter

Letter: FROM GERALD L WALLACE Film code number CCCL-2015-333490

Letter

Letter: FROM GERALD L WALLACE Film code number CCCL-2015-342118

Motion for Continuance

Motion for Continuance: UNOPPOSED Film code number CCCL-2015-342140

Rule 11 Agreement

Rule 11 Agreement

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • Reactivate Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter: FROM GERALD L WALLACE Film code number CCCL-2016-1548

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • Electronic Filing Fee: NOTICE AND ORDER OF NONSUIT AND LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter: FROM GERALD L. WALLACE Film code number CCCL-2015-417014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Rule 11 Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • Electronic Filing Fee: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING AGREEMENT REGARDING SETTLEMENT PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING AGREEMENT REGARDING SETTLEMENT AND LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order for Continuance: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS'UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE Film code number CCCL-2015-342251

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2014
  • Attorney Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • Attorney Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • Attorney Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • Attorney Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • Electronic Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • E-Filing Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • Jury Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • RECEIVABLE GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Initiation Event (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLONIAL COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO Secure Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Geico Choice Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Geico Advantage Insurance Company is a litigant