Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/15/2017 at 21:05:29 (UTC).

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE ET AL. VS. ALNAJI REEM RASAIM

Case Summary

On 08/06/2014 GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALNAJI REEM RASAIM. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERTA LLOYD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1361

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERTA LLOYD

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHAW DANIEL N.

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

GEICO SECURE INSURANCE

GEICO INDEMNITY

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE

GEICO CHOICE INSURANCE

GEICO CASUALTY,

GEICO ADVANTAGE INSURANCE

COLONIAL COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

GEICO CASUALTY

DANIEL N. SHAW

Defendants

RASAIM ALNAJI REEM

Houston, TX 77084

HAMRA ENTERPRISE

ALNAJI REEM RASAIM

Houston, TX 77084

Not Classified By Court

Jose R Lopez, II

Houston, TX 77007

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BENNETT CARLA

Attorney at DAVID KNIGHT & ASSOCIATES

217 Avondale

Houston, TX 77006

BENNETT, CARLA

217 Avondale

Houston, TX 77006

 

Court Documents

Case Initiation Event (OCA)

Case Initiation Event (OCA)

Citation Issued

Citation Issued

Crt 4-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 4-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Citation Returned

Citation Returned: SERVED 09-08-14 APPEARANCE DATE 09-29-14 Film code number CCCL-2014-306205

Answer

Answer: DEFENDANT REEM ALNAJI/DBA CAR ZONE TOWING ORIGINAL ANSWER Film code number CCCL-2014-346358

Crt 4-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 4-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 4-Order for Trial Resetting-Jury

Crt 4-Order for Trial Resetting-Jury

Crt 4-Order for Trial Resetting-Jury

Crt 4-Order for Trial Resetting-Jury

Amended Answer

Amended Answer: DEFENDANT ALNAJI REEM RASAIM AMENDED ANSWER Film code number CCCL-2015-70997

Amended Petition

Amended Petition: PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED PETITION Film code number CCCL-2015-76627

First Amended Petition Citation Issued

First Amended Petition Citation Issued

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Letter

Letter: LETTER FILED BY ALNAJI REEM RASAIM DEFENDANT PROVIDING PHONE NUMBER TO COURT Film code number CCCL-2015-176204

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter: LETTER FILED BY ALNAJI REEM RASAIM DEFENDANT PROVIDING PHONE NUMBER TO COURT Film code number CCCL-2015-176204

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • Electronic Filing Fee: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NONSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • Conversion Service Event: Executed: N;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • First Amended Petition Citation Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Petition: PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED PETITION Film code number CCCL-2015-76627

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • Electronic Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • E-Filing Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2014
  • Attorney Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • Attorney Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • Attorney Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • Attorney Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • Electronic Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • E-Filing Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • Jury Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • RECEIVABLE GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Initiation Event (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLONIAL COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO Secure Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Geico Choice Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Geico Advantage Insurance Company is a litigant