Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 04/08/2021 at 13:32:56 (UTC).

FRANCOS PROPERTIES VS FANNIE TAYLOR

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 FRANCOS PROPERTIES filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against FANNIE TAYLOR. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4007

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRANCOS PROPERTIES

C/O Alexis Diaz 6219 Jensen Dr

Houston, TX 77026

Defendant

FANNIE TAYLOR

Houston, TX 77093

 

Court Documents

Notice

Notice

Funds to Registry of Court

Funds to Registry of Court: TO BE DEPOSITED INTO THE REGISTRY OF THE COURT $650.00

Pauper's Eviction

Pauper's Eviction: FILED BY FANNIE T. TAYLOR

JP Fax Confirmation

JP Fax Confirmation: REQUEST TO TRANSFER FUNDS

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

JP Military Status Affidavit

JP Military Status Affidavit

JP Citation

JP Citation

(Eviction) Declaration

(Eviction) Declaration: #1

JP Citation Returned

JP Citation Returned

Letter from Justice of the Peace Court

Letter from Justice of the Peace Court: From Shawna Evans

JP Notice of Trial Setting

JP Notice of Trial Setting

JP Notice

JP Notice: State of Texas Eviction Diversion Program

JP Judgment

JP Judgment

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Notice

JP Notice: of Filing Statement of Inability to Afford Payment of Costs to Appeal an Eviction Judgment

JP Notice

JP Notice: of Filing Appeal Bond or Statement of Inability to Afford Payment of Costs to Appeal a Judgment in a Non-Payment of Rent Eviction

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

JP Index

JP Index

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketFunds to Registry of Court: DEPOSIT JP APPEAL:201200236348 VOUCHER #00311419 $650.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFunds to Registry of Court: TO BE DEPOSITED INTO THE REGISTRY OF THE COURT $650.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPauper's Eviction: FILED BY FANNIE T. TAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Fax Confirmation: REQUEST TO TRANSFER FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Military Status Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(Eviction) Declaration: #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: Verification of Compliance With Section 4024 of the Cares Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter from Justice of the Peace Court: From Shawna Evans

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice of Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: State of Texas Eviction Diversion Program

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: of Filing Statement of Inability to Afford Payment of Costs to Appeal an Eviction Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: of Filing Appeal Bond or Statement of Inability to Afford Payment of Costs to Appeal a Judgment in a Non-Payment of Rent Eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTranscript from Justice of the Peace Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Index

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Francos Properties is a litigant