This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/04/2020 at 15:15:11 (UTC).

FOUNTAIN OAKS APARTMENTS VS TACHET L. WRIGHT

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 FOUNTAIN OAKS APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TACHET L WRIGHT. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6670

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fountain Oaks Apartments

C/O Zuleika Garcia 5601 Chimney Rock

Houston, TX 77081

Defendant

Tachet L. Wright

Houston, TX 77081

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOURNIER, SCOTT H

3311 Richmond Ave. Suite 305

Houston, TX 77098

 

Court Documents

Writ of Property Possession Returned

Writ of Property Possession Returned: Served

Letter of Assignment H01148

Letter of Assignment: Filed with the 14th COA

Fax Sheet

Fax Sheet: Tames record submission filed with the 14th COA.

Caption H01146

Caption: Clerk's Record (Indigent)

Certification Page H01145

Certification: Clerk's Record (Indigent)

Letter

Letter: From Fourteenth Court of Appeals

Letter

Letter: From Fourteenth Court of Appeals

Request WRIT from County.pdf

Writ of Possession to be Issued: BY CONSTABLE

Writ of Possession on Property (Court Judgment)

Writ of Property Possession Issued: CONSTABLE

JP Military Status Affidavit

JP Military Status Affidavit

JP Citation

JP Citation

JP Citation Returned

JP Citation Returned

JP Judgment

JP Judgment

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL AN EVICTION JUDGMENT

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

JP Index

JP Index

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Property Possession Returned: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Property Possession Issued: CONSTABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession to be Issued: BY CONSTABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter: From Fourteenth Court of Appeals

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter: From Fourteenth Court of Appeals

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter of Assignment: Filed with the 14th COA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFax Sheet: Tames record submission filed with the 14th COA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCaption: Clerk's Record (Indigent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertification: Clerk's Record (Indigent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBill of Cost: Clerk's Record (Indigent)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Fax Confirmation: REQUEST TO TRANSFER FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Military Status Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF FILING STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL AN EVICTION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTranscript from Justice of the Peace Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Index

    Read MoreRead Less