This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 11/01/2022 at 19:18:13 (UTC).

F.I.R.S.T. LLC VS BRON & CLAUDE ENGINEERING, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/11/2022 F I R S T LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRON CLAUDE ENGINEERING, LLC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7956

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

F.I.R.S.T. LLC

Defendant

BRON & CLAUDE ENGINEERING, LLC

8523 Twillingate Lane

Houston, TX 77040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anziani, Jose Javier

Attorney at Freedman Price, PC

1102 West Ave., Suite 200

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

Harris County - Truegrit - Mail One Cit.pdf

Citation to Be Issued: See Letter

Bron & Claude Engineering - POP.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O TRUE GRIT

Amended Petition Citation

First Amended Petition Citation Issued: M/O TRUE GRIT - SECT. OF STATE

Harris County -TruGrit - SOS - One Def.pdf

Amended Citation to be Issued

Bron & Claude Engineering - First Amen POP.pdf

Amended Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Petition Citation Issued: M/O TRUE GRIT - SECT. OF STATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Citation to be Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O TRUE GRIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: Plaintiff's Original Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued: See Letter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANZIANI, JOSE JAVIER