Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/15/2017 at 11:53:28 (UTC).

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION VS. ELMO WABINGTON ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/28/2014 FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ELMO WABINGTON. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERTA LLOYD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6852

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERTA LLOYD

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION,

333 Clay, 29Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Defendants

SWANZY EILEEN

Richmond, TX 77407

WABINGTON ELMO

Houston, TX 77092

JONES ITOLIA

Houston, TX 77092

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Houston, TX 77092

ITOLIA JONES

Houston, TX 77092

ELMO WABINGTON

Houston, TX 77092

EILEEN SWANZY

Richmond, TX 77407

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

VARNER DOMINIQUE M

Attorney at HUGHES WATTERS & ASKANASE LLP

333 Clay, 29Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

VARNER, DOMINIQUE

1201 Louisiana Street 28Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION,

Attorney at HUGHES WATTERS & ASKANASE LLP

333 Clay, 29Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

Civil Case Information Sheet

Civil Case Information Sheet: JP APPEALED JUSTICE COURT Film code number CCCL-2014-140722

JP Receipts

JP Receipts

JP Receipts

JP Receipts

JP Citation Returned

JP Citation Returned: ELMO WABINGTON AND ALL OCCUPANTS Film code number CCCL-2014-140729

JP Citation Returned

JP Citation Returned: ITOLIA JONES AND ALL OCCUPANTS Film code number CCCL-2014-140730

Appeal

Appeal: JP APPEALED Film code number CCCL-2014-140731

Appeal Bond

Appeal Bond: JP APPEALED EVICTION CASE APPEAL BOND (SURETY) Film code number CCCL-2014-140736

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Exhibit

Exhibit

Writ of Posession to be Issued

Writ of Posession to be Issued

Writ of Property Possession Issued

Writ of Property Possession Issued

Writ of Possession on Person Property Returned

Writ of Possession on Person Property Returned: EXECUTED Film code number CCCL-2014-236326

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession on Person Property Returned: EXECUTED Film code number CCCL-2014-236326

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • Conversion Service Event: Executed: N;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Property Possession Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • Electronic Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Posession to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Exhibit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Appeal Bond: JP APPEALED EVICTION CASE APPEAL BOND (SURETY) Film code number CCCL-2014-140736

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Appeal: JP APPEALED Film code number CCCL-2014-140731

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Citation Returned: ITOLIA JONES AND ALL OCCUPANTS Film code number CCCL-2014-140730

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Citation Returned: ELMO WABINGTON AND ALL OCCUPANTS Film code number CCCL-2014-140729

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Receipts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Receipts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Information Sheet: JP APPEALED JUSTICE COURT Film code number CCCL-2014-140722

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • RECEIVABLE GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Varner, Dominique