This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 11/29/2022 at 21:21:43 (UTC).

ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF ZAID HAKKI VS AYANA BURTON

Case Summary

On 07/06/2022 ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF ZAID HAKKI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AYANA BURTON. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7761

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF ZAID HAKKI

Defendant

AYANA BURTON

Houston, TX 77038

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Loftis, Paula

Po Box 655441

Dallas, TX 75265

 

Court Documents

166 Petition_Rule 193_7 Notc_L_TXA0260670.1 signed.pdf

eFile Original Petition: with citation issuance

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY PAULA LOFTIS

1187761 Service Affidavit on Ayana Burton.pdf

Return of Service: 1187761 Service Affidavit on Ayana Burton

Answer

Answer

Proposed Order.pdf

Proposed Order: Default Judgment---Answer on file

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Default Judgment---Answer on file

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service: 1187761 Service Affidavit on Ayana Burton

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY PAULA LOFTIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: with citation issuance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF MATTHEW LOFTIN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Loftis, Paula