Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 04/08/2021 at 13:34:00 (UTC).

ERENDIRA ROMAN CRUMMETT VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 ERENDIRA ROMAN CRUMMETT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE BARNSTONE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4020

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE BARNSTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Erendira Roman Crummett

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

211 East 7Th Street Ste 620

Austion, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FORESTER, KELLY PATRICK

Attorney at MATTHEWS & FORESTER

3027 Marina Bay Drive, Ste 320

League City, TX 77573

 

Court Documents

Civil Process Request.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

Alias Citation

Alias Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

return of citation service

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

Plaintiff's Original Petition.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Civil Process Request Form.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Civil Case Information Sheet.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Plaintiff's Original Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAlias Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: Plaintiff's Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FORESTER, KELLY PATRICK