Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 07/20/2021 at 16:22:48 (UTC).

ELIZABETH GUAJARDO VS JENNIFER BAILEY,BENNY BAILEY

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 ELIZABETH GUAJARDO filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against JENNIFER BAILEY,BENNY BAILEY. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE BARNSTONE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4005

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE BARNSTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELIZABETH GUAJARDO

Houston, TX 77049

Defendants

JENNIFER BAILEY

Houston, TX 77049

BENNY BAILEY

Houston, TX 77049

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Withdrawal

Certificate of Withdrawal

Affidavit of Check Disbursement

Affidavit of Check Disbursement

Proposed Order

Proposed Order

Proposed Order

Proposed Order: proposed judgment

Order to Withdraw Funds - sent to Judge

Order to Withdraw Funds

Final Judgment

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

FJNJ - sent to Judge

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

JP Judgment

JP Judgment

JP Order

JP Order: om CDC Declaration

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Notice

JP Notice: of Filing Appeal Bond or Statement of Inability to Afford Payment of Costs to Appeal a Judgment in a Non-Payment of Rent Eviction

JP Notice

JP Notice: of Filing Statement of Inability to Afford Payment of Costs to Appeal an Eviction Judgment

Letter from Justice of the Peace Court

Letter from Justice of the Peace Court: From Mar Tovar

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

JP Notice

JP Notice: Bill of Costs

JP Index

JP Index

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Check Disbursement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Withdrawal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Withdraw Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: proposed judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granted: Order Granting CDC Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion: to Set Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Granting CDC Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Order: om CDC Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: of Filing Appeal Bond or Statement of Inability to Afford Payment of Costs to Appeal a Judgment in a Non-Payment of Rent Eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: of Filing Statement of Inability to Afford Payment of Costs to Appeal an Eviction Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter from Justice of the Peace Court: From Mar Tovar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTranscript from Justice of the Peace Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: Bill of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Index

    Read MoreRead Less