This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/17/2017 at 10:26:56 (UTC).

ELEAZAR GARZA ET AL. VS. TOMASA CRUZ

Case Summary

On 11/13/2015 ELEAZAR GARZA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TOMASA CRUZ. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is THERESA CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0093

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

THERESA CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GARZA MARIELSY

GARZA ELEAZAR

MARIELSY GARZA

ELEAZAR GARZA

ARIELY GARZA

Defendants and Plaintiffs

GARZA ARIELY

CRUZ TOMASA

Houston, TX 77033

TOMASA CRUZ

Houston, TX 77033

ARIELY GARZA

Not Classified By Court

Joan Marie Lucci Bain

Houston, TX 77043

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

GHUNEIM WISAM S

Attorney at THE GHUNEIM LAW FIRM

3115 Preston, Suite F

Pasadena, TX 77505

GHUNEIM, WISAM

3115 Preston Road Suite F

Pasadena, TX 77505

BENNETT, PETER J.

202 Travis Street, Suite 207

Houston, TX 77002

ANDERSON KATHRYN P

Attorney at THE ANDERSON FIRM, LLC

5629 Cypress Creek Parkway, Suite 216

Houston, TX 77069

MCALISTER, CATHY LEA

Attorney at THE ANDERSON FIRM, LLC

5629 Cypress Creek Parkway, Suite 216

Houston, TX 77069

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Information Sheet

Civil Case Information Sheet

Answer

Answer: DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER Film code number CCCL-2016-32389

Agreed Motion

Agreed Motion: FOR CONTINUANCE Film code number CCCL-2016-163845

Crt 2-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 2-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 2-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 2-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Affidavit

Affidavit: Medical Records pertaining to Ariely Garza

Spencer Emg Phys Records Affidavit-Ariely.pdf

Affidavit: OF MEDICAL RECORDS

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

Notice

Notice: Fee sheet for guardian ad litem

Case Initiation Event (OCA)

Case Initiation Event (OCA)

Crt 2-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

Crt 2-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

Citation Issued

Citation Issued

Crt 2-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 2-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 2-Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Crt 2-Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Motion for Continuance

Motion for Continuance: AGREED Film code number CCCL-2016-229281

Billing Affidavit-Ariely Garza.pdf

Affidavit: Certification of Medical Bills

Affidavit

Affidavit: of cost of services by custodian

Spencer Emg Phys Billing Affidavit-Marielsy.pdf

Affidavit: OF COST OF SERVICES BY CUSTODIAN

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Appearance: Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice: Fee sheet for guardian ad litem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proposed Order: Appointing Guardian Ad-Litem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit: OF MEDICAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit: OF COST OF SERVICES BY CUSTODIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit: OF COST OF SERVICES BY CUSTODIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit: of medical records

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit: of cost of services by custodian

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Crt 2-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • Attorney Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • Attorney Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • E-Filing Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • Electronic Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • RECEIVABLE GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Initiation Event (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENNETT, PETER J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anderson, Kathryn P

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCALISTER CATHY LEA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GHUNEIM, WISAM