This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 08/01/2020 at 18:29:01 (UTC).

ELDA MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. VS YVONNE GARCIA,ARNOLD RIGGS,ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 ELDA MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against YVONNE GARCIA,ARNOLD RIGGS,ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE BARNSTONE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6533

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE BARNSTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELDA Management Services, Inc.

C/O Brandon Meyer 6300 La Calma Dr, Suite 150

Austin, TX 78752

Defendants

All Other Occupants

Houston, TX 77023

Yvonne Garcia

Houston, TX 77023

Arnold Riggs

Houston, TX 77023

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMOS, DUKE

Attorney at THE AMOS LAW FIRM

4118 Fannin St #208

Houston, TX 77004

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Withdrawal

Certificate of Withdrawal

Affidavit of Check Disbursement

Affidavit of Check Disbursement

Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance

Final Judgment

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Exhibits

Exhibits: FROM TRIAL

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION IN AN EVICTION PROCEEDING

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION IN AN EVICTION PROCEEDING

JP Request for Appeal

JP Request for Appeal

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COURT COSTS OR AN APPEAL BOND OR EVICTION SUIT FOR NON-PAYMENT OF RENT

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COURT COSTS OR AN APPEAL BOND TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN AN EVICTION CASE

JP Order

JP Order

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

JP Index

JP Index

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Withdrawal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Check Disbursement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibits: FROM TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketFunds to Registry of Court: DEPOSIT JP APPEAL 196100436143 RECEIPT #2019-045 $1,350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPauper's Eviction: FILED BY YVONNE GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Fax Confirmation: REQUEST TO TRANSFER FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Military Status Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION IN AN EVICTION PROCEEDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION IN AN EVICTION PROCEEDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Request for Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COURT COSTS OR AN APPEAL BOND OR EVICTION SUIT FOR NON-PAYMENT OF RENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF FILING STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COURT COSTS OR AN APPEAL BOND TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN AN EVICTION CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTranscript from Justice of the Peace Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Index

    Read MoreRead Less