Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 04/30/2021 at 05:52:04 (UTC).

EDUARDO HUERTA VS BELINDA GARZA

Case Summary

On 11/11/2020 EDUARDO HUERTA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BELINDA GARZA. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE BARNSTONE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1198

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE BARNSTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EDUARDO HUERTA

Defendant

BELINDA GARZA

Baytown, TX 77520

Not Classified By Court

Steven C Howard

Houston, TX 77098

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PORTZ III, CHARLES H

411 Fannin, Ste. 200

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorneys

Peirce, Jonathan R.

909 Fannin, Suite 250

Houston, TX 77010

SALMON, BARRETT REED

Attorney at WALTERS, BALIDO & CRAIN, LLP Meadow Park Tower

10440 N. Central Expressway, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75231

 

Court Documents

Notice of Intention to take Deposition by Written Questions

Notice: of Intention to take Deposition by Written Questions

Notice of Intention to take Deposition by Written Questions

Notice: of Intention to take Deposition by Written Questions

GARZA'S AGREED MOTION TO SUB COUNSEL.PDF

Motion to Substitute Counsel

GARZA ORDER GRANTING SUB COUNSEL.PDF

Proposed Order

Order to Substitute- Sent to Judge

Order to Substitute Counsel

DEPO NOTICE - HUERTA.pdf

Notice: Deposition Notice

Huerta vs Garza .1.pdf

Deposition: Notice of Intention

Notice of Intention to Take Deposition

Notice: of Intention to take Deposition by Written Questions

Huerta vs Garza .2.pdf

Notice: of Intention

Huerta - Answer, Jury Demand & RFD.pdf

Answer: Jury Fee Paid

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

11232004.pdf

Return of Service

Scanned-image_11-11-2020-161029.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Citation to be issued

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeposition: Notice of Intention

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: of Intention to take Deposition by Written Questions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: of Intention

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Substitute Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Deposition Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Substitute Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: of Intention to take Deposition by Written Questions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: of Intention to take Deposition by Written Questions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: Jury Fee Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: Citation to be issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PORTZ III, CHARLES H