This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 11/27/2021 at 16:25:11 (UTC).

DUANE EADEN VS ANDREW PAUL AEGERTER,JAIRUS CONSTRUCTION, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 DUANE EADEN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANDREW PAUL AEGERTER,JAIRUS CONSTRUCTION, LLC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6297

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Duane Eaden

Defendants

Andrew Paul Aegerter

Kingwood, TX 77343

Jairus Construction, LLC

C/O Robert T Smith Jr 5730 Greens Road

Houston, TX 77032

Not Classified By Court

Michael D Murphy

Houston, TX 77005

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRASE, SCOTT R.

3D International Tower 1900 West Loop South, 20Th Floor

Houston, TX 77027

Defendant Attorneys

WRIGHT, MICHAEL STOUT

6363 Woodway Drive Suite 820

Houston, TX 77057

DRAVIS, TED E., Jr.

Attorney at Raffalow, Bretoi, Lutz & Stele

13620 N Fm 620, Building B, Suite 125

Austin, TX 78717

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Rule 11 Settlement

Rule 11 Agreement: Settlement

CWD-D's RRFD.pdf

Certificate of Written Discovery: to Dft. Aegerter's Response to Plt. Request for Disclosure.

Dft. Aegerter Original Answer.pdf

Answer

2021.06.01 Section 18.001 Counter Affidavit of Marilyn Pacheco C.P.C. with Exhs [D. Eaden].pdf

Notice: Defendants' Notice of Filing Affidavit

2021.06.01 Defendant Notice of Filing Affidavit.pdf

Notice: Defendants' Notice of Filing Affidavit

Plaintiff's First Notice Filing of Affidavits..pdf

Notice: Plaintiff's First Notice of Filing Affidavits

2021.06.03 Ntc Firm Name Change - Eaden.pdf

Notice: Notice of Firm Name Change

2021.04.30 Deft Jairus Orig Answer.pdf

Answer: Jury Fee Paid

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

AFF EFILE - 56040.pdf

Affidavit of Service: Jairus Construction, LLC/Reg. Agent Robert T. Smith Jr

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRule 11 Agreement: Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Written Discovery: to Dft. Aegerter's Response to Plt. Request for Disclosure.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Notice of Firm Name Change

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Defendants' Notice of Filing Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Plaintiff's First Notice of Filing Affidavits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service: Jairus Construction, LLC/Reg. Agent Robert T. Smith Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: Jury Fee Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service: - Andrew Paul Aegerter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued: Previously paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY SCOTT R. FRASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATY SCOTT R. FRASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: Jury Fee Paid **NOTES**

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jairus Construction, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRASE, SCOTT R.