This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 08/31/2020 at 17:25:19 (UTC).

DORMAKABA USA INC. VS HWAMI BUILDER LLC

Case Summary

On 08/21/2019 DORMAKABA USA INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HWAMI BUILDER LLC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9887

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DORMAKABA USA INC.

Defendant

HWAMI BUILDER LLC

8585 Commerce Park Dr

Houston, TX 77036

Not Classified By Court

DONALD SEPOLIO

Houston, TX 77006

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TOTZ, JON D

Attorney at TOTZ ELLISON & TOTZ PC

2211 Norfolk, Suite #510

Houston, TX 77098

TOTZ, ANDREW B.

Attorney at Totz Ellison Totz

2211 Norfolk, Suite 510

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorney

Andang, Anissah

Attorney at NGUYEN & CHEN, LLP

11200 Westheimer, Ste 120

Houston,, TX 77042

 

Court Documents

99970 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss.pdf

Motion to Dismiss

99970 Proposed Order.pdf

Proposed Order

99970 Clerk Letter.pdf

Letter

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

99970 Proposed Order.pdf

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Order to Compel

Order to Compel

Order Granted

Order Granted: to strike mediation and sending to DRC

Exhibit B - Defendant's Response to Plaintiff s Discovery Demands

Response: TO PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS AND RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY

Exhibit A - Plaintiff s Discovery Demands

Response: TO PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS AND RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY

DEFENDANT S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS AND RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY

Response: TO PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS AND RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY

Exhibit C - Email Communication

Response: TO PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS AND RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY

Proposed ORDER Denying Motion to Compel and Sanctions

Response: TO PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS AND RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY

Exhibit B - Email Communication

Response: TO PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO STRIKE MEDIATION ORDER

Exhibit A - Order for Referral for Mediation

Response: TO PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO STRIKE MEDIATION ORDER

DEFENDANT S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO STRIKE MEDIATION ORDER

Response: TO PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO STRIKE MEDIATION ORDER

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Compel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granted: to strike mediation and sending to DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse: TO PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS AND RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse: TO PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO STRIKE MEDIATION ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Written Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDesignation: Plaintiff's Designation of Expert Witnesses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter: Clerk Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: DEFENDANT S ORIGINAL ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, VERIFIED DENIAL, AND RULE 194 REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: HOLD FOR LOOP LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DORMA USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOTZ, ANDREW B.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOTZ, JON D