This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 08/31/2020 at 17:01:21 (UTC).

DISTRIBUTION INTERNATIONAL, INC. VS GEORGE S VASQUEZ

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 DISTRIBUTION INTERNATIONAL, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GEORGE S VASQUEZ. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE BARNSTONE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6614

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE BARNSTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Distribution International, Inc.

Defendant

George S Vasquez

Houston, TX 77015

Not Classified By Court

Andy Siegel

Houston, TX 77006

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mcqueen, Dennis A

1415 Louisiana 22Nd Fl

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorney

NICHAMOFF, SETH A.

2444 Times Blvd #270

Houston, TX 77005

 

Court Documents

Exhibit List-Filed-01.pdf

Exhibit List

Letter

Letter

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order Granting New Trial - H 3/17

Order for New Trial (OCA): Granted in submission

Plaintiff's Response To Defendant's Motion for New Trail.pdf

Response: to Defendant's Motion for New Trial

Resale Certificate

Response: to Defendant's Motion for New Trial

Correspondence

Response: to Defendant's Motion for New Trial

Statement

Response: to Defendant's Motion for New Trial

Affidavit of Anthony Broussard

Response: to Defendant's Motion for New Trial

Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees

Response: to Defendant's Motion for New Trial

Forfeiture

Response: to Defendant's Motion for New Trial

Order Denying Defendant's Motion for New Trial.pdf

Proposed Order

Notice of Submission-01.pdf

Notice of Submission

Notice of Hearing - Vasquez.pdf

Notice of Hearing

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for New Trial (OCA): Granted in submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse: to Defendant's Motion for New Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for New Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Order for Defendant's Motion for New Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Submission: not set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service: Return of Service P269584_001.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less