This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/03/2020 at 15:19:33 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS YESSENIA X CABRERA

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against YESSENIA X CABRERA. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE BARNSTONE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6619

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE BARNSTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

YESSENIA X CABRERA

Houston, TX 77085

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Owens, Sharrard D

Attorney at ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

14090 Sw Freeway, Suite 408

Sugarland, TX 77478

 

Court Documents

dj.cabrera.mtn_20200129092659.pdf

Motion for Default Judgment

dj.cabrera.exh_20200129092711.pdf

Motion for Default Judgment

dj.cabrera.ord_20200129092728.pdf

Proposed Order

dj.cabrera.ord_20200129092728.pdf

Default Judgment and Notice

NOTICE-DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Default Judgment and Notice

NOTICE-DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Default Judgment and Notice

5502680 AFF.pdf

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O TO EZ

5502680-36239602-Unfiled Original Petition-iK8pHYkN8nqwVKO.PDF

eFile Original Petition

5502680_nM7ChtGN3uEQfuw.pdf

Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O TO EZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less