This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 08/02/2020 at 00:08:33 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS WISSAM ABDELRAHMAN

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WISSAM ABDELRAHMAN. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6627

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

WISSAM ABDELRAHMAN

Houston, TX 77063

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Owens, Sharrard D

Attorney at ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

14090 Sw Freeway, Suite 408

Sugarland, TX 77478

Defendant Attorney

COOKSEY , GUY KELLY

2000 Crawford, Ste. 1380

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

2020.06.03 First Motion for Continuance.pdf

Motion for Continuance

ABDELRAHMAN_PLT MFC.pdf

Motion for Continuance: PLAINTIFF S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

ABDELRAHMAN_PLT MFC ORDER.pdf

Proposed Order: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: Order for Trial Setting Via Video Conference- Unclaimed

20200316_DIS_ABDELRAHMAN,WISSAM_MOTION.PDF

Motion for Summary Judgment

20200316_DIS_ABDELRAHMAN,WISSAM_EXH.PDF

Motion for Summary Judgment

20200316_DIS_ABDELRAHMAN,WISSAM_PROPOSED ORDER.PDF

Proposed Order: SUMMARY JUDGMENT

5502688-36800928-PdVJEIac8D1iplp.pdf

Return of Service

2020.02.17 Abdelrahman Original Answer.pdf

Answer

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: MAIL TO EZM

5502688-36239645-Unfiled Original Petition-dR7aDUnLYEMGeqk.pdf

eFile Original Petition

5502688_fQStOtT6VKYWzyw.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: Order for Trial Setting Via Video Conference- Unclaimed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Continuance: PLAINTIFF S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: MAIL TO EZM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less