This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/02/2020 at 14:11:13 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS TOM V VO

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TOM. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6648

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

TOM V VO

Houston, TX 77027

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Owens, Sharrard D

Attorney at ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

14090 Sw Freeway, Suite 408

Sugarland, TX 77478

 

Court Documents

5502737-36777814-eJXJcYdO4PTdXMk.pdf

Return of Service

5502737-36777814-OTqccJ7yC8nlTzC.pdf

Return of Service

dj.vo,tom.mtn_20200312092835.pdf

Motion for Default Judgment

dj.vo,tom.exh_20200312092843.pdf

Motion for Default Judgment

dj.vo,tom.ord_20200312092857.pdf

Proposed Order

dj.vo,tom.ord_20200312092857.pdf

Default Judgment and Notice

NOTICE-DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Default Judgment and Notice

NOTICE-DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Default Judgment and Notice

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O EZ MESS

5502737-36240065-Unfiled Original Petition-2vUOBuBqw1CaIhP.PDF

eFile Original Petition

5502737_rqQNWqu86U1tyeq.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O EZ MESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less