This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 11/09/2021 at 15:49:43 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS SHANIQUA C COLEMAN

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHANIQUA C COLEMAN. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4731

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Shaniqua C Coleman

Spring, TX 77379-8789

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lincer, Joseph Chase

15660 N Dallas Parkway, Suite 350

Dallas, TX 75248

 

Court Documents

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC

RSIEH_4194447_let_eABC.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

4194447 pet.pdf

eFile Original Petition

Lead_ProofofServiceorNonService_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Return of Service

4194447_order.pdf

Proposed Order: for Continuance

4194447_Motion.pdf

Motion for Continuance

Nonsuit Order - to Judge.pdf

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

4194447_NS ORDER.pdf

Proposed Order: NONSUIT ORDER

4194447_NTC OF NS.pdf

Motion for Non-Suit

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: NONSUIT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: for Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lincer, Joseph Chase