This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 07/05/2020 at 00:54:48 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS LUSCALORS L NANA YOBO

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LUSCALORS L NANA YOBO. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6650

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

LUSCALORS L NANA YOBO

Houston, TX 77003

Not Classified By Court

DOUGLAS B. WILSON

Houston, TX 77058

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Owens, Sharrard D

Attorney at ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

14090 Sw Freeway, Suite 408

Sugarland, TX 77478

Defendant Attorney

BELL, KATHERYN COLE

4401 Nw 4Th Street, Suite 109

Lahoma City, OK 73107

 

Court Documents

20200501_DIS_NANA YOBO,LUSCALORS_RULE 11.pdf

Rule 11 Agreement: Rule 11 Settlement Agreement

20200501_DIS_NANA YOBO,LUSCALORS_RULE_AJ.pdf

Proposed Order: Agreed Judgment

Agreed Judgment.pdf

Agreed Judgment and Notice

NOTICE AGREED JUDGMENT

Agreed Judgment and Notice

NOTICE AGREED JUDGMENT

Agreed Judgment and Notice

5502738-36669385-wXQg2b25hlKSfes.pdf

Return of Service

20.01.31 Yobo OA.pdf

Answer: Defendant's Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Petition

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O TO EZ

5502738-36240076-Unfiled Original Petition-Y2h4SG04dSZRh4K.PDF

eFile Original Petition

5502738_NjvzDg2Hixg0Cw6.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreed Judgment and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRule 11 Agreement: Rule 11 Settlement Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Agreed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: Defendant's Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O TO EZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less