This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 08/01/2020 at 21:57:33 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS JOE CARDONA

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOE CARDONA. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE BARNSTONE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6631

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE BARNSTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

JOE CARDONA

Houston, TX 77034

Not Classified By Court

Dispute Resolution Center

49 San Jacinto Suite 220

Houston, TX 77002-1233

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Owens, Sharrard D

Attorney at ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

14090 Sw Freeway, Suite 408

Sugarland, TX 77478

 

Court Documents

1146631_MFC.pdf

Motion for Continuance: PLAINTIFF S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

1146631_MFC ORDER.pdf

Proposed Order: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

20200303_DIS_CARDONA,JOE_MOTION.PDF

Motion for Summary Judgment

20200303_DIS_CARDONA,JOE_EXH.PDF

Motion for Summary Judgment

20200303_DIS_CARDONA,JOE_PROPOSED ORDER.PDF

Proposed Order: Summary Judgment

20200311_DIS_CARDONA,JOE_NOTICE.PDF

Notice of Hearing: not set - bad date

20200311_DIS_CARDONA,JOE_NOTICE.PDF

Notice of Hearing

5502687 aff.pdf

Return of Service

Answer

Answer

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O TO EZ

5502687-36239642-Unfiled Original Petition-sywfNU6YaPE3cSw.PDF

eFile Original Petition

5502687_P1wWmXcmfRf0a6V.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Continuance: PLAINTIFF S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing: not set - bad date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation to DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O TO EZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less