This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/02/2020 at 12:38:58 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY VS SHERESE OAKLAND,ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SHERESE OAKLAND,ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6674

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company

Defendants

All Occupants

Houston, TX 77072

Sherese Oakland

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Murphy, Max M.

82222 Douglas Avenue, Suite 400

Dallas, TX 75225

Defendant Attorney

Prisock, Kerry L

5177 Richmond Ave., Ste 1142

Houston, TX 77056

 

Court Documents

Letter

Letter: COURT OF APPEALS FIRST DISCTRICT

Letter

Letter: COURT OF APPEALS FIRST DISTRICT

Transcript

Transcript: Filed with the 1st COA.

2020-01-20 N of Appeal Oakland.pdf

Notice of Appeal

Letter of Assignment H01148

Letter of Assignment: Filed with the 1st COA

Fax Sheet

Fax Sheet: Tames Record Submission of the LOA to the 1st COA

Caption H01146

Caption: Clerks Record (Indigent)

Certification Page H01145

Certification: Clerks Record (Indigent)

Bill of Cost (Appeals) H01311

Bill of Cost: Clerk's Record (Indigent)

JP Citation Returned

JP Citation Returned

JP Notice

JP Notice: PLEA TO THE JURISDICTION, MOTION TO DISMISS, AND ANSWER

JP Judgment

JP Judgment: #1

JP Judgment

JP Judgment: #2

JP Request for Appeal

JP Request for Appeal

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL AN EVICTION JUDGMENT

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

JP Index

JP Index

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter: COURT OF APPEALS FIRST DISCTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter: COURT OF APPEALS FIRST DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTranscript: Filed with the 1st COA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter of Assignment: Filed with the 1st COA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFax Sheet: Tames Record Submission of the LOA to the 1st COA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCaption: Clerks Record (Indigent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertification: Clerks Record (Indigent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBill of Cost: Clerk's Record (Indigent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial: bond $7,200.00

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice of Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: PLEA TO THE JURISDICTION, MOTION TO DISMISS, AND ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Judgment: #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Judgment: #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Request for Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF FILING STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL AN EVICTION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTranscript from Justice of the Peace Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Index

    Read MoreRead Less