This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 01/15/2022 at 13:57:05 (UTC).

DALY & BLACK, P.C. VS WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 DALY BLACK, P C filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE, INC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5806

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daly & Black, P.C.

Defendant

Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.

C/O Corporation Service Company701 Brazos St, Suite 1050

Austin, TX 78701

Not Classified By Court

Fran Watson

Houston, TX 77036

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALY, RICHARD D

Attorney at RICHARD DALY LAW FIRM

2211 Norfolk St. Suite 800

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorneys

DUFFY, ELIZABETH KRISTIN

Attorney at LOCKE LORD LLP

2200 Ross Avenue Suite 2800

Dallas, TX 75201

McCammon, Jennifer

600 Travis St., Ste 2800

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

21.09.28 Original Petition - Daly.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Citation to be issued - Cert. Mail thru County Clerk

Original Petition CMCC RRR Citation

Original Petition Citation CMCC RRR Issued: CERT. MAIL # 7009 2820 0001 7461 8094

Defendant's Original Answer(Daly & Black).pdf

Answer: Defendant's Original Answer

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Unopposed Motion To Allow Jennifer Juergens To Withdraw As Counsel(Black).pdf

Motion to Withdraw Counsel: Already Subsitute Counsel per notice of appearance

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW(Black).pdf

Motion to Withdraw Counsel: Already Subsitute Counsel per notice of appearance

Notice of Appearance - Cause No. 1175806.pdf

Notice of Appearance

Citation Returned

Citation Returned: Unserved

Vacation Letter - E. Duffy - Cause No. 1175806.pdf

Letter: Vacation Letter-E. Duffy

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter: Vacation Letter-E. Duffy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Returned: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Withdraw Counsel: Already Subsitute Counsel per notice of appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: Defendant's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation CMCC RRR Issued: CERT. MAIL # 7009 2820 0001 7461 8094

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: Citation to be issued - Cert. Mail thru County Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McCammon, Jennifer