This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/02/2020 at 13:14:55 (UTC).

CYPRESS RIDGE APARTMENTS VS WENDY NEWSON

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 CYPRESS RIDGE APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WENDY NEWSON. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6581

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cypress Ridge Apartments

C/O Eddie Dean Young 6300 La Calma Dr, Ste 150

Austin, TX 78752

Defendant

Wendy Newson

Houston, TX 77014

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMOS, DUKE

Attorney at THE AMOS LAW FIRM

4118 Fannin St #208

Houston, TX 77004

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Check Disbursement

Affidavit of Check Disbursement

Letter of Representation (CYPRESS v NEWSON)-signed.pdf

Notice of Appearance

Final Judgment

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial: and Withdraw of Funds

Final Judgment

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial: and Withdraw of Funds

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial: and Withdraw of Funds

Writ (WENDY NEWSON).pdf

Writ of Possession to be Issued

Writ of Possession on Property (Court Judgment)

Writ of Property Possession Issued: CONSTABLE

Certificate of Withdrawal

Certificate of Withdrawal

Writ of Property Possession Returned

Writ of Property Possession Returned: Unserved

JP Officer's Sworn Request for Alt Svc Under Rule 742A

JP Officer's Sworn Request for Alt Svc Under Rule 742A

JP Citation Returned

JP Citation Returned

JP Judgment

JP Judgment

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL AN EVICTION JUDGMENT

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL AN EVICTION JUDGMENT

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

JP Index

JP Index

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Check Disbursement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Withdrawal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Property Possession Returned: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Property Possession Issued: CONSTABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketFunds to Registry of Court: DEPOSIT JP APPEAL 194100425338 RECEIPT #2019-785 $1,205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial: and Withdraw of Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPauper's Eviction: FILED BY WENDY NEWSON

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Officer's Sworn Request for Alt Svc Under Rule 742A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF FILING STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL AN EVICTION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF FILING STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL AN EVICTION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTranscript from Justice of the Peace Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Index

    Read MoreRead Less