This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 11/23/2022 at 11:07:10 (UTC).

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC VS YARIANNYS M VASQUEZ

Case Summary

On 08/10/2022 CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against YARIANNYS M VASQUEZ. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9747

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crown Asset Management, Llc

Defendant

Yariannys M Vasquez

Houston, TX 77084-1248

Not Classified By Court

Dispute Resolution Center

49 San Jacinto, Suite 220

Houston, TX 77002-1233

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lowery, Talisha K

15660 N Dallas Parkway, Suite 350

Dallas, TX 75248

 

Court Documents

RSIEH_4581473_let_eABC.pdf

Citation to Be Issued: See Letter

RSIEH_4581473_pet_eABC.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC

Lead_ProofofServiceorNonService_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Return of Service

Answer

Answer

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

4581473_COWD.pdf

Certificate of Written Discovery

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Written Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation to DRC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued: See Letter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: Plaintiff's Original Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dispute Resolution Center is a litigant

Latest cases where Crown Asset Management LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TaLisa Karene Lowery