This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/02/2020 at 12:35:54 (UTC).

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC VS THOMAS OCHOA,CLAUDIA CANAS

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against THOMAS OCHOA,CLAUDIA CANAS. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE BARNSTONE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6673

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE BARNSTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crown Asset Management, LLC

Defendants

Thomas Ochoa

Houston, TX 77044-6386

Claudia Canas

Kingwood, TX 77399-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Olsen-Zhang, Jessica

Attorney at Rausch, Sturm, Israel, Enerson & Hornik LLC

15660 N Dallas Parkway #350

Dallas, TX 75248

 

Court Documents

Alias Citation Request

Alias Citation to be Issued

Alias Citation

Alias Citation Issued: M/O ABC DALLAS

Lead_Summons_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Return of Service

Lead_Summons_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC DALLAS

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC DALLAS

3893507 pet.pdf

eFile Original Petition

3893507 let.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAlias Citation Issued: M/O ABC DALLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAlias Citation to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC DALLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC DALLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less