This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 08/01/2020 at 23:08:25 (UTC).

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC VS COURTNEY GOVELLA

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against COURTNEY GOVELLA. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6530

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crown Asset Management, LLC

Defendant

COURTNEY GOVELLA

17335 Stone Peaks Dr

Houston, TX 77095-7185

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ADDISON, BRANDI MARIE

Attorney at RAUSCH STURM

15660 N. Dallas Parkway Suite 350

Dallas, TX 75248

 

Court Documents

5500299-36813313-ihkDuHayOswgQej.pdf

Citation Returned: Unserved

3893737_NOTICE.PDF

Motion for Non-Suit

3893737_ORDER.PDF

Proposed Order: ORDER GRANTING NON SUIT

3893737_ORDER.PDF

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Adms Disc Int Prod Citation Issued: M/O TO EZ

5500299-36255587-pJghKyalmAy3KtO.pdf

eFile Original Petition

5500299-36256609-rv8cuIQEsG16EvK.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: ORDER GRANTING NON SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Returned: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Adms Disc Int Prod Citation Issued: M/O TO EZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less