This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/20/2023 at 14:15:41 (UTC).

COMMERCIAL INTERIOR PRODUCTS INC VS. THOMPSON THRIFT CONSTRUCTION INC ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/01/2013 COMMERCIAL INTERIOR PRODUCTS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against THOMPSON THRIFT CONSTRUCTION INC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MIRYEA AYALA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5196

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MIRYEA AYALA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMMERCIAL INTERIOR PRODUCTS INC

Defendants

THOMPSON THRIFT CONSTRUCTION INC

FIDELITY DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Portz, Chuck

 

Court Documents

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT FIDELITY DEPOSIT COMPANY Film code number CCCL-2013-309981

Original Petition Disclosures Citation Issued

Original Petition Disclosures Citation Issued

Original Petition Disclosures Citation Issued

Original Petition Disclosures Citation Issued

Crt 4-Status Conference and Notice of Intent to Dismiss

Crt 4-Status Conference and Notice of Intent to Dismiss

Civil Case Information Sheet

Civil Case Information Sheet

Case Initiation Event (OCA)

Case Initiation Event (OCA)

 

Docket Entries

09/19/2013
View Court Documents

DocketNon-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2013

DocketRECEIPT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2013

DocketElectronic Filing Fee: MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/03/2013
View Court Documents

DocketAffidavit of Service: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT FIDELITY DEPOSIT COMPANY Film code number CCCL-2013-309981

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2013

DocketConversion Service Event: Executed: N;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2013
View Court Documents

DocketOriginal Petition Disclosures Citation Issued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2013

DocketConversion Service Event: Executed: N;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2013
View Court Documents

DocketOriginal Petition Disclosures Citation Issued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2013
View Court Documents

DocketCrt 4-Status Conference and Notice of Intent to Dismiss

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2013

DocketRECEIPT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2013
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Information Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2013

DocketRECEIVABLE GENERATED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2013
View Court Documents

DocketCase Initiation Event (OCA)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less