Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 02/27/2018 at 14:37:12 (UTC).

CITY OF PEARLAND VS PIONEER BUILDERS, INC.,THE TAXING AUTHORITIES OF HOUSTON ISD,THE TAXING AUTHORITIES OF HARRIS COUNTY,THE TAXING AUTHORITIES OF HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL,THE TAXING AUTHORITIES OF PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY,THE TAXING AUTHORITIES

Case Summary

On 12/14/2017 CITY OF PEARLAND filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PIONEER BUILDERS, INC ,THE TAXING AUTHORITIES OF HOUSTON ISD,THE TAXING AUTHORITIES OF HARRIS COUNTY,THE TAXING AUTHORITIES OF HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL,THE TAXING AUTHORITIES OF PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY,THE TAXING AUTHORITIES. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LINDA STOREY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3142

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LINDA STOREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Pearland

Defendants

The Taxing Authorities of Harris County Education Department

C/O Ann Harris Bennett 1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

The Taxing Authorities of Harris County

C/O Ann Harris Bennett 1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

The Taxing Authorities of City of Pearland

Angleton, TX 77515

The Taxing Authorities of Harris County Hospital District

C/O Ann Harris Bennett 1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

The Taxing Authorities of Houston Community College

C/O Ann Harris Bennett 1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

The Taxing Authorities of Houston ISD

C/O Ann Harris Bennett 1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

The Taxing Authorities of Port of Houston Authority

C/O Ann Harris Bennett 1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

The Taxing Authorities of Harris County Flood Control

C/O Ann Harris Bennett 1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

Pioneer Builders, Inc.

C/O William Boyd, Patterson, Boyd, & Lowery, Pc 2102 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

The Taxing Authorities of Lower Kirby Pearland Management District

C/O Kenneth R Byrd Po Box 73109

Houston, TX 77273

Commissioners

Gus Kanakis

Houston, TX 77008

JOHN PHILLIP MUSTACHIO

Houston, TX 77005

BRENDA Z. PAGE

Houston, TX 77008

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEBLAK, ROBERT P, III

1001 Fannin Street Suite 2700

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

Parcel 1 (Pioneer Builders) Case Cover Sheet (00699299xB9BBA).PDF

Civil Case Information Sheet

Parcel 1 (Pioneer Builders) - Exhibit A and B (00699292xB9BBA).PDF

eFile Original Petition

Parcel 1 (Pioneer Builders) - Original Petition (00699293xB9BBA).PDF

eFile Original Petition

Parcel 1 (Pioneer Builders) - Order Appointing Special Commissioners (00699296xB9BBA).PDF

Proposed Order: Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Parcel 1 - Oath of Commissioners (00701717xB9BBA).PDF

Proposed Order: Oath of Commissioners

Parcel 1 - Order Setting Time and Place of Hearing (00701716xB9BBA).PDF

Proposed Order: Order Setting Time and Place of Hearing

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Pioneer Builders Inc's Objection -1103142.pdf

Objections

Proposed Order - 1103142.pdf

Proposed Order

Parcel 1 (Pioneer) - Order of Non-suit (00714998xB9BBA).PDF

Motion for Non-Suit: Without Prejudice

Parcel 1 (Pioneer) - Notice of Non-Suit without Prejudice (00714996xB9BBA).PDF

Motion for Non-Suit: Without Prejudice

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suit/Dismissal Order

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Non-Suit: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Objections

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Appointing Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proposed Order: Order Setting Time and Place of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proposed Order: Oath of Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proposed Order: Order Appointing Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • eFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Original Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TAXING AUTHORITIES OF HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Paul Debelak III