Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 11/20/2018 at 15:04:14 (UTC).

CITY OF PEARLAND VS JULIA MAZOW,JACK MAZOW,THE UNKNOWN HEIRS OF EDGAR ELLIS,MALCOLM MAZOW,THE TAXING AUTHORITIES OF HOUSTON ISD,THE TAXING AUTHORITIES OF HARRIS COUNTY,THE TAXING AUTHORITIES OF HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL,THE TAXING AUTHORITIES OF PO

Case Summary

On 02/16/2018 CITY OF PEARLAND filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JULIA MAZOW,JACK MAZOW,THE UNKNOWN HEIRS OF EDGAR ELLIS,MALCOLM MAZOW,THE TAXING AUTHORITIES OF HOUSTON ISD,THE TAXING AUTHORITIES OF HARRIS COUNTY,THE TAXING AUTHORITIES OF HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL,THE TAXING AUTHORITIES OF PO. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERTA LLOYD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6242

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERTA LLOYD

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Intervenors

City of Pearland

Houston, TX 77008

Debbie Raaberg

Defendants and Intervenors

Jack Mazow

Houston, TX 77002

The Taxing Authorities of Harris County Education Department

C/O Ann Harris Bennett 1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

The Taxing Authorities of Harris County

C/O Ann Harris Bennett 1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

The Taxing Authorities of City of Pearland

Houston, TX 77002

The Taxing Authorities of Harris County Hospital District

C/O Ann Harris Bennett 1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

The Taxing Authorities of Houston Community College

C/O Ann Harris Bennett 1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

The Taxing Authorities of Houston ISD

C/O Ann Harris Bennett 1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

Julia Mazow

Houston, TX 77002

The Taxing Authorities of Port of Houston Authority

C/O Ann Harris Bennett 1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

The Unknown Heirs of Edgar Ellis

The Taxing Authorities of Harris County Flood Control

C/O Ann Harris Bennett 1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

Malcolm Mazow

Alvin, TX 77511

The Taxing Authorities of Lower Kirby Pearland Mgmt District

C/O Ann Harris Bennett 1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

Debbie Raaberg

Commissioners

Peggy Hamric

Houston, TX 77069

JOHN W OWENS

Houston, TX 77082

THOMAS M. HENDERSON

Houston, TX 77027

Not Classified By Court

FREDERICK ALLEN KRASNY

Sugar Land, TX 77478

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEBLAK, ROBERT P, III

1001 Fannin Street Suite 2700

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant and Intervenor Attorneys

MCFARLAND, CHARLES BLACK

Attorney at McFarland PLLC

811 Louisiana St. Ste 2520

Houston, TX 77002

KRASNY, FREDERICK ALLEN

Attorney at FRED KRASNY PC

14015 S.W. Freeway, Ste 14

Sugar Land, TX 77478

SCHOBER, JAMES MATTHEW

Attorney at SCHOBER & SCHOBER, P.C.

400 W. 15Th Street, Ste. 1405

Austin, TX 78701

Darlow, Michael J

Attorney at PERDUE BRANDON FIELDER COLLINS

1235 North Loop W #600

Houston, TX 77008

 

Court Documents

Defendants' Agreed Motion to Withdraw Award.pdf

Motion to Withdraw Funds: Agreed Motion to Withdraw Award of Special Commissioners

Defendants' Agreed Motion to Withdraw Award - Order.pdf

Proposed Order: Order Granting Agreed Motion to Withdraw Award

Defendants' Agreed Motion to Withdraw Award - Amended.pdf

Motion: Amended Agreed Motion to Withdraw Award of Special Commissoners

Defendants' Agreed Motion to Withdraw Award - Order - Amended.pdf

Proposed Order

Order to Withdraw Funds

Order to Withdraw Funds

Parcel 8 (Mazow)- Final Judgment.pdf

Proposed Order: Final Judgment--S/W MR. DEBELAK II 7-10 HOLD OFF ON SUBMITTING FJ

2018.0710 Plea in Intervention.pdf

Intervention

2018.0710 Objection to Motion to Withdraw Funds.pdf

Objections: to Motion to Withdraw Funds

2018.0710 Exhibit A (to Objection to Motion to Withdraw).pdf

Objections: to Motion to Withdraw Funds

Parcel 8 (Mazow) - Exhibit A to Original Petition (00714497xB9BBA).PDF

eFile Original Petition

Parcel 8 (Mazow) - Original Petition (00714498xB9BBA).PDF

eFile Original Petition

Parcel 8 (Mazow) - Order Appointing Special Commissioners (00714503xB9BBA).PDF

Proposed Order: Appointing Special Commissioners

Parcel 8 (Mazow) - Order setting time and place of hearing (00714500xB9BBA).PDF

Proposed Order: Setting Time and Place of Hearing

Parcel 8 (Mazow) - Oath of Commissioners (00714499xB9BBA).PDF

Proposed Order: Oath of Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Oath of Special Commissioner

Oath of Special Commissioner

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Withdraw Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion: Amended Agreed Motion to Withdraw Award of Special Commissoners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proposed Order: Order Granting Agreed Motion to Withdraw Award

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Withdraw Funds: Agreed Motion to Withdraw Award of Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Objections: to Motion to Withdraw Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Intervention

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proposed Order: Final Judgment--S/W MR. DEBELAK II 7-10 HOLD OFF ON SUBMITTING FJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter: to Clerk Passing Submission of Defendants Motion to Withdraw Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notices Returned: Award of Special Commissioners-Return to Sender/Insufficient Address/Unable to Forward

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Appoint Attorney Ad Litem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Citation by Publication to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Oath of Special Commissioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Appointing Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proposed Order: Oath of Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proposed Order: Setting Time and Place of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proposed Order: Appointing Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • eFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Original Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TAXING AUTHORITIES OF HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant