This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/17/2017 at 19:37:02 (UTC).

CITY OF HOUSTON VS. JASWINDER SINGH VIRK ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/01/2016 CITY OF HOUSTON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JASWINDER SINGH VIRK. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is THERESA CHANG. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4367

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

THERESA CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Defendant

CITY OF HOUSTON

Defendants

HOUSTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

HUFFINES ENERGY, INC.

CITY OF HOUSTON

HARRIS COUNTY, TEXAS

6012 AVENUE T. LLC

AMARJIT SINGH VIRK

JASWINDER SINGH VIRK

GURMIT KAUR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

QUINTAL, JOSEPH N

Attorney at SENIOR ASSISTANT CITY ATTORNEY

900 Bagby 3Rd Fl.

Houston, TX 77001-0368

 

Court Documents

Order

Order: ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS Film code number CCCL-2016-79547

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Citation Returned

Citation Returned: SERVED ON 6-6-16 APPEARANCE DATE 6-27-16 Film code number CCCL-2016-276685

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: Award - Return to sender/Unable to Forward

Disclaimer

Disclaimer

Citation Returned

Citation Returned: SERVED ON 6-7-16 APPEARANCE DATE 7-4-16 Film code number CCCL-2016-276690

Final Judgment in Absence of Objections

Proposed Order: Final Judgment in Absence of Objections

Oath of Special Commissioner

Oath of Special Commissioner

Citation Returned

Citation Returned: SERVED ON 6-3-16 APPEARANCE DATE 6-27-16 Film code number CCCL-2016-276693

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Final Judgment in Absence of Objections

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisclaimer: Disclaimer of Partial Interest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter: FROM MARK B. SIMPSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketFunds to Registry of Court: To be deposited into the registry Award $5,651.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: Award - Return to sender/Unable to Forward

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: Award - Return to sender/Unable to Forward

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: Award - Return to sender/Unable to Forward

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: Award - Return to sender/Unable to Forward

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: AWARD OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS JOSEPH N QUINTAL Film code number CCCL-2016-292569

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2016
  • DocketElectronic Filing Fee: DISCLAIMER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Petition: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION Film code number CCCL-2016-172659

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • DocketRECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • DocketElectronic Filing Fee: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION IN CONDEMNATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOath of Special Commissioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder: ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS Film code number CCCL-2016-79547

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • DocketRECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • DocketElectronic Filing Fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • DocketRECEIVABLE GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Initiation Event (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Harris County, Texas is a litigant

Latest cases where Houston Independent School District is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer QUINTAL JOSEPH N.