This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 10/02/2022 at 20:12:10 (UTC).

CITY OF HOUSTON VS GREENS 69 OWNER LP,CITY OF HOUSTON AND HARRIS COUNTY,ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 CITY OF HOUSTON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against GREENS 69 OWNER LP,CITY OF HOUSTON AND HARRIS COUNTY,ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7622

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Houston

Houston,, TX 77002

Defendants

Greens 69 Owner LP

Charles Mcfarland And Laura Manion, 811 Louisiana Street Suite 2520

Houston, TX 77002

City of Houston and Harris County

Houston, TX 77002

Aldine Independent School District

Julie Gazelas, 14909 Aldine Wesfield Rd.

Houston, TX 77032

Commissioners

Felecia Y. Peavy

Houston, TX 77253

BERNARDO J. GARCIA

Houston, TX 77018

SETH HERSCHEL KRETZER

Houston, TX 77074

Not Classified By Court

Michael S Narsete

Houston, TX 77056

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Beard, Randall Steven

Attorney at CITY OF HOUSTON C/O STEVEN BEARD

P.O. Box 368

Houston, TX 77001-0368

Defendant Attorney

MCFARLAND, CHARLES BLACK

Attorney at McFarland PLLC

811 Louisiana St. Ste 2520

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: Award of Special Commissioners - Donald Stricklin - Emailed.

Defendant's Objections to Award of Special Commissioners.pdf

Objections: Defendant's Objections and Exceptions to the Award of Special Commissioners

Order Setting Fees of Special Commissioners (submitted)

Order Setting Commissioners Fees

Award of Special Commissioners (submitted)

Award: of Special Commissioners

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Notice of Hearing of Special Commissioners

Notice of Hearing of Special Commissioners

Return of Service

Return of Service

Notice of Hearing of Special Commissioners

Notice of Hearing of Special Commissioners

Oath

Oath of Special Commissioner

Special Commissioners' Statement of Service

Statement: Special Commissioners' Statement of Service

Order Setting Commissioners Fee

Proposed Order: Order Setting Commissioners Fee

Award of Special Commissioners

Proposed Order: Award of Special Commissioners

Defendant's Notice of Appearance.pdf

Notice of Appearance: Defendant's Notice of Appearance

Order Appointing Special Commissioners (submitted)

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOath of Special Commissioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement: Special Commissioners' Statement of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Order Setting Commissioners Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Award of Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: Award of Special Commissioners - Donald Stricklin - Emailed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjections: Defendant's Objections and Exceptions to the Award of Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Setting Commissioners Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAward: of Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing of Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing of Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance: Defendant's Notice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: Plaintiff's Original Petition in Condemnation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Order Appointing Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCFARLAND, CHARLES BLACK