This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 12/05/2022 at 22:10:28 (UTC).

CITY OF HOUSTON VS AMBERS AIRPORT CAB CO.,UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (BY VIRTUE OF ITS SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION),STATE OF TEXAS,CITY OF HOUSTON AND HARRIS COUNTY,ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 09/19/2022 CITY OF HOUSTON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against AMBERS AIRPORT CAB CO ,UNITED STATES OF AMERICA BY VIRTUE OF ITS SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION ,STATE OF TEXAS,CITY OF HOUSTON AND HARRIS COUNTY,ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MIRYEA AYALA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1803

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MIRYEA AYALA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Houston

Defendants

Ambers Airport Cab Co.

United States of America (by virtue of its Small Business Administration)

State of Texas

City of Houston and Harris County

Aldine Independent School District

14909 Aldine Westfield Rd.

Houston, TX 77032

Commissioners

Franshneka Jene Watson

Houston, TX 77036

Gagan Khan

Houston, TX 77077

Davida Norris

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Beard, Randall Steven

Attorney at CITY OF HOUSTON C/O STEVEN BEARD

P.O. Box 368

Houston, TX 77001-0368

 

Court Documents

Notice of Deposit Writ of Possession

Notice: of Deposit

Funds to Registry of Court

Funds to Registry of Court: To be deposited into the Registry of the Court - Award $16,298.00

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: Award of Special Commissioners - Jennifer Lowery, U.S. Attorney for the Southern District of Texas.

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: Award of Special Commissioners

Order Setting Fees to the Special Commissioners - to Judge

Order Setting Commissioners Fees

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: Award of Special Commissioners-Donald Stricklin-Emailed

Order Setting Fees to the Special Commissioners

Proposed Order: Order Setting Fees to the Special Commissioners

Special Commissioners' Statement of Services

Statement: Special Commissioners' Statement of Services

Award of Special Commissioners

Proposed Order: Award of Special Commissioners

Order Setting Hearing Before Commissioners

Order: Setting Hearing Before Commissioners

Oath of Commissioners

Oath of Special Commissioner

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

Affidavit of Service

Return of Service

Original Petition

eFile Original Petition

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Proposed Order

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners - to Judge

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: of Deposit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFunds to Registry of Court: To be deposited into the Registry of the Court - Award $16,298.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: Award of Special Commissioners - Jennifer Lowery, U.S. Attorney for the Southern District of Texas.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: Award of Special Commissioners

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Setting Commissioners Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: Award of Special Commissioners-Donald Stricklin-Emailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAward: of Special Commissioners

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Order Setting Fees to the Special Commissioners

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement: Special Commissioners' Statement of Services

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Award of Special Commissioners

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder: Setting Hearing Before Commissioners

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOath of Special Commissioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Special Commissioners

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ambers Airport Cab Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Beard, Randall Steven