Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 04/15/2021 at 14:43:25 (UTC).

CITY OF GALENA PARK VS MARIBEL CANTU,JOSE ALONSO HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 CITY OF GALENA PARK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARIBEL CANTU,JOSE ALONSO HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5707

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Galena Park

Defendants

Jose Alonso Hernandez

Galena Park, TX 77547

Maribel Cantu

Galena Park, TX 77547

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Collins, Robert L

 

Court Documents

Return of Service

Return of Service

Return of Service

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY ROBERT L. COLLINS - ADMIN. & INTERROG.

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY ROBERT L. COLLINS - ADMIN & INTERROG.

Hernandez Request for Service FINAL.pdf

eFile Original Petition: City of Galena Park's Original Petition for Breach of Contract

Cantu Request for Service FINAL.pdf

eFile Original Petition: City of Galena Park's Original Petition for Breach of Contract

Exhibit B Payment Chart.pdf

eFile Original Petition: City of Galena Park's Original Petition for Breach of Contract

Exhibit A Settlement 601 n Main ALL SIGNED.pdf

eFile Original Petition: City of Galena Park's Original Petition for Breach of Contract

2021-03-01 601 N Main Street - Breach of contract original petition w discovery FINAL.pdf

eFile Original Petition: City of Galena Park's Original Petition for Breach of Contract

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY ROBERT L. COLLINS - ADMIN. & INTERROG.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY ROBERT L. COLLINS - ADMIN & INTERROG.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: City of Galena Park's Original Petition for Breach of Contract

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert L. Collins