This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 08/02/2020 at 00:07:08 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. VS MICHAEL S WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHAEL S WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6597

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Citibank, N.a.

Defendant

Michael S Williams

Humble, TX 77396

Not Classified By Court

SEAN KELLY MCPHERSON

Houston, TX 77009

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Griffin, Crystal

Attorney at Morgan & Associates P.C

2601 Nw Expressway, Suite 205E

Lahoma City, OK 73112

Defendant Attorney

AYRES, CHRISTOPHER G

11 Broadway, Suite 960

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

2572052 CJ.pdf

Proposed Order: CONSENT JUDGMENT

2572052 MILAFF.pdf

Notice: Attestation as to Military Service

2572052 CJ.pdf

Agreed Judgment and Notice

NOTICE AGREED JUDGMENT

Agreed Judgment and Notice

NOTICE AGREED JUDGMENT

Agreed Judgment and Notice

Answer_Williams, Michael .pdf

Answer

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Lead_Summons_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O TO ABC-DALLAS

MorganAndAssociates_2572052%5FC_pet_eABC.pdf

eFile Original Petition

MorganAndAssociates_2572052%5FC_let_eABC.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreed Judgment and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: CONSENT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Attestation as to Military Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O TO ABC-DALLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less