This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 02/27/2020 at 14:35:41 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. VS JERRIA WEST PLATTENBURG

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JERRIA WEST PLATTENBURG. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE BARNSTONE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6593

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE BARNSTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Citibank, N.a.

Defendant

Jerria West Plattenburg

Houston, TX 77073

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Griffin, Crystal

Attorney at Morgan & Associates P.C

2601 Nw Expressway, Suite 205E

Lahoma City, OK 73112

 

Court Documents

Order for Rule 106

Order for Rule 106

MorganAndAssociates_2535117%5FC_let_eABC.pdf

Letter

MorganAndAssociates_2535117%5FC_pet_eABC.pdf

eFile Original Petition

Lead_Motion_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Motion for Substituted Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC DALLAS

Lead_Summons_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Return of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Rule 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Substituted Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC DALLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less