Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 07/12/2021 at 14:50:49 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. VS JAVED N BHATTI

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JAVED N BHATTI. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4025

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Citibank, N.A.

Defendant

Javed N Bhatti

Tomball, TX 77375-1178

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vernon, Michael S.

Attorney at Morgan & Associates, P.C.

2601 Nw Expressway Suite 205E

Oklahoma City, TX 73112

 

Court Documents

1164025 DWOP.pdf

Motion to Dismiss: without Prejudice

1164025 ORDER.pdf

Proposed Order: for Dismissal Without Prejudice

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

ORDER OF DISMISSAL TO JUDGE.pdf

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Lead_ProofofServiceorNonService_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC

MorganAndAssociates_2636387_C_pet_eABC.pdf

eFile Original Petition

MorganAndAssociates_2636387_C_let_eABC.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss: without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: for Dismissal Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael S. Vernon