This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 08/08/2020 at 14:00:02 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. VS GIGI DO

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GIGI DO. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6582

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK, N.A.

Defendant

GIGI DO

Houston, TX 77019-5515

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WRIGHT, DAVID

Attorney at MOSS LAW FIRM, P.C.

P.O. Box 3340

Lubbock, TX 79452-3340

Defendant Attorney

Fernandez, David

2190 North Loop West Suite 333

Houston, TX 77018

 

Court Documents

318644 - Do - AMFC.pdf

Agreed Motion: AGREED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE with ORDER

318644 - AMFC - 1146582.pdf

Motion for Continuance

318644 -ORDER GRANTING AMFC - 1146582.pdf

Proposed Order

ooe.pdf

Notice: Offering of Evidence Pursuant to Rule 902 (10) of the Texas Rules of Evidence

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Adms Disc Int Prod Citation Issued: PCP

318644 - P's CWD- 1146582.pdf

Certificate of Written Discovery

Do, Gigi - DOA.pdf

Answer

AX40A19B07089.pdf

eFile Original Petition: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

AX40A19B07089CL.PDF

Citation to Be Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreed Motion: AGREED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE with ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Offering of Evidence Pursuant to Rule 902 (10) of the Texas Rules of Evidence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Adms Disc Int Prod Citation Issued: PCP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Written Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less